U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clifford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 09, 2024: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 03, 2024: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 01, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 29, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 25, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 28, 2021: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 28, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 08, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 08, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 18, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea and Scheduling Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 30, 2021: [Consent]
  • April 30, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 01, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 01, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 02, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Transcript]
  • January 21, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 13, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [In Limine]
  • September 01, 2020: [Objection]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [In Limine]
  • August 26, 2020: [Brief]
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice]
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice]
  • August 20, 2020: [Request]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Text Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 03, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 01, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 28, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • May 28, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • May 27, 2020: [Objection]
  • May 27, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • May 27, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Request]
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 07, 2020: [Request]
  • April 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 06, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 06, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 03, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 03, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 03, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • April 03, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 03, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • April 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.