U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lafferty
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 09, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 04, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 04, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 19, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 21, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 21, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 12, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 12, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 12, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 22, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [Request]
  • January 22, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 27, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 27, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 27, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 27, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 27, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 26, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.