U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Butterfly
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • May 02, 2022: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 11, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 19, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 19, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 19, 2021: [Consent]
  • November 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 08, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 08, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 03, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 16, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 09, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 29, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 07, 2020: [Request]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 07, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 07, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 03, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 03, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 03, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.