U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dooley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 25, 2021: [Compel]
  • October 15, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Consent]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 05, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 05, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 05, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 25, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 25, 2021: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 24, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • May 24, 2021: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 24, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 17, 2021: [For Order]
  • May 14, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 14, 2021: [In Limine]
  • May 14, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • May 14, 2021: [For Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 22, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 21, 2021: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • April 15, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 15, 2020: [Transcript]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • August 14, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • July 08, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 08, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 28, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 27, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 23, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 17, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 30, 2020: [Furlough]
  • March 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Response to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 21, 2020: [Extend]
  • January 14, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 14, 2020: [Suppress]
  • January 02, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Request]
  • December 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 30, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • December 26, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 23, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 23, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 23, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 19, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.