U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McDaniel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Text Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Objection]
  • September 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 16, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 08, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 17, 2022: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 15, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • August 12, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 02, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
  • March 01, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 06, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • May 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 03, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 30, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 30, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 19, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 12, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 26, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 26, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 26, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 25, 2021: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • February 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 23, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 23, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 09, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 02, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 22, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • September 22, 2020: [Transcript]
  • September 22, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 17, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • September 17, 2020: [Witness List]
  • September 15, 2020: [Response]
  • September 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 08, 2020: [Suppress]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 20, 2020: [Request]
  • August 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 20, 2020: [Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 20, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 20, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 20, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 20, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 19, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 19, 2020: [Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 19, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 19, 2020: [Request]
  • August 19, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 19, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.