U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trippler et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • September 02, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Passport - Receipt of]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • May 05, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 18, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extend]
  • April 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Certificate]
  • March 23, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 21, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 24, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 24, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 10, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 15, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice]
  • October 14, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 13, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 07, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 22, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • July 12, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 06, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Declaration of Publication]
  • June 14, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 14, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2021: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 14, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 14, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 11, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 08, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 08, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 04, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 03, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 01, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 01, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 28, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 19, 2021: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 19, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • May 18, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 17, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 11, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 10, 2021: [Consent]
  • May 10, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 10, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2021: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 03, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 17, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 16, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 11, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 11, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 11, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 09, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 08, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 05, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 05, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 24, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 17, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 13, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 23, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 22, 2020: [Request]
  • December 22, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 18, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 16, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 15, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 07, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 07, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 24, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 05, 2020: [Arraignment]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 21, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 19, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 15, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 13, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 13, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 13, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 08, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • October 08, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • October 08, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • October 07, 2020: [Receipt for Payment]
  • October 01, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 23, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 21, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 14, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 08, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 08, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 04, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 04, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 02, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 02, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 28, 2020: [Request]
  • August 26, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 26, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 25, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 25, 2020: [Discovery]
  • August 25, 2020: [Request]
  • August 25, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 25, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 24, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 21, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 21, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 20, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • August 20, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 20, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • August 20, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 19, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • August 18, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 17, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 17, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 14, 2020: [Leave to]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 10, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 05, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 30, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 23, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 23, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 22, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 22, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • July 21, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 21, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 17, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 14, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 14, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 02, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 25, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 18, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 18, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 18, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 17, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 10, 2020: [Suppress]
  • June 09, 2020: [Suppress]
  • June 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 28, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 28, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 28, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 21, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 15, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 14, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • April 14, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • April 13, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • April 09, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • April 07, 2020: [Suppress]
  • April 07, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 25, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 11, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 21, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 30, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 27, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 24, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 23, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 23, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 23, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 23, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 23, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 22, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 07, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2020: [Request]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 27, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • December 23, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 20, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • December 19, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 19, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 18, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.