U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50174-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGuire
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 16, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 09, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 09, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 09, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 18, 2021: [Extend]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 19, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 09, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 04, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 04, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 19, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 18, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 18, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 02, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Bail Report]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 06, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Sealed Evaluation]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Furlough]
  • December 30, 2019: [Request]
  • December 30, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 26, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 23, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 20, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.