U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 29, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 15, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 15, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 15, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 15, 2020: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • January 15, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • January 15, 2020: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 14, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.