U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bartels et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 26, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 08, 2020: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 21, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 17, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 16, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 16, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 08, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 14, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 14, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 31, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 31, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 27, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 22, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 17, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 10, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 10, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 12, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 07, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 07, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 07, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 17, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 17, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 17, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 13, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 09, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Extend]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 14, 2020: [Extend]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • February 06, 2020: [Bill of Particulars]
  • February 04, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 08, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 07, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice]
  • December 30, 2019: [Request]
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 27, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 27, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 27, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 27, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 27, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 27, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 27, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 20, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 19, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.