U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Standing Soldier, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 22, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 08, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 13, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 13, 2020: [Consent]
  • March 13, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 20, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 20, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 20, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 27, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 07, 2020: [Request]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 03, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 03, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 02, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.