U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50158-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tate
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • August 26, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 29, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 28, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 28, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 27, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 27, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 27, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 23, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 21, 2021: [Hearing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 16, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • July 13, 2021: [Transcript]
  • July 02, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 12, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 22, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 22, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 02, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 19, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 10, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 02, 2020: [Response to Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Furlough]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 24, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 31, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 22, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice]
  • January 13, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 10, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 03, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 02, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.