U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 22, 2022: [USCA Order]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 03, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Transcript - Redacted]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • October 26, 2021: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • October 13, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • October 06, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 06, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 05, 2021: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • October 05, 2021: [Transcript]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 22, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 15, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 13, 2021: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 10, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 07, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 07, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 07, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 03, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 01, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Transcript]
  • August 27, 2021: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 27, 2021: [Extend]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 13, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • June 25, 2021: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • June 25, 2021: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 25, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 24, 2021: [Verdict]
  • June 24, 2021: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • June 24, 2021: [Jury Question]
  • June 24, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 24, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • June 24, 2021: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 24, 2021: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • June 23, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 23, 2021: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • June 23, 2021: [Jury List]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 17, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • June 17, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 17, 2021: [Response]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • June 15, 2021: [In Limine]
  • June 14, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 14, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 17, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 17, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 17, 2021: [In Limine]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • May 13, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 13, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice]
  • May 11, 2021: [In Limine]
  • May 11, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • May 10, 2021: [In Limine]
  • May 03, 2021: [Notice]
  • May 03, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 30, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 16, 2021: [Notice]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 04, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Consent]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 26, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 25, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • February 21, 2020: [Reconsideration]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [Request]
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 24, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 24, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 24, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 24, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 24, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 06, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.