U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-03002
  • Case Name: Producers Livestock Credit Corporation v. Rowen, Jr et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • June 07, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Adversary Proceeding]
  • June 07, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation for Dismissal]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • May 26, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • May 25, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • May 25, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • May 24, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reschedule (pre-trial/trial/hearing)]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • April 26, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reschedule (pre-trial/trial/hearing)]
  • April 26, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reschedule Pre-trial/Trial/Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial]
  • March 02, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transcript (Depositions and 2004 Exams Only)]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reschedule (pre-trial/trial)]
  • January 26, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reschedule (pre-trial/trial)]
  • August 18, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Interrogatory Answers]
  • March 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • March 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response to Request for Admissions/Production of Documents]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • February 05, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • February 05, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Interrogatories]
  • February 05, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • February 05, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 05, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • January 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • January 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • January 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.