U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50165-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Larson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2025: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Declaration of Publication]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • November 02, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Response]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • April 26, 2022: [Declaration]
  • April 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 26, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 25, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 25, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 11, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 11, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 08, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 08, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 08, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 05, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 28, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 27, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 14, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 01, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 25, 2021: [Consent]
  • June 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 25, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 02, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 02, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice]
  • May 26, 2021: [Brief]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • May 26, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 26, 2021: [In Limine]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [For Order]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 10, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Request]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 08, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 08, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 08, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 08, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 08, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 08, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 07, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.