U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-10002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 13, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: [Sentencing]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 12, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 01, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 01, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • February 01, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2020: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 18, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 18, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 18, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 28, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 26, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 25, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 25, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • February 21, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2020: [Request]
  • February 03, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 03, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.