U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dorn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 27, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.