U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-De Jesus
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 23, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 23, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 17, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2020: [Response]
  • January 13, 2020: [Request]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 13, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 13, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 08, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.