U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bald Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • July 01, 2022: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • July 01, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 06, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Competency Report]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 26, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 24, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order for Psychiatric Examination]
  • May 17, 2021: [Competency Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 13, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Response]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 31, 2021: [Furlough]
  • March 30, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 29, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Furlough]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 04, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 03, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 01, 2020: [Furlough]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • October 14, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Competency Report]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Sealed Order]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 16, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Request]
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 30, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 29, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 29, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 29, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 27, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 27, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 08, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.