U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • January 20, 2023: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • January 19, 2023: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • January 18, 2023: [Extend]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 09, 2023: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 04, 2023: [Extend]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Furlough]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Expert Witness]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 06, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice]
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 13, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • August 06, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2021: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 25, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 16, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Furlough]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2020: [Notice]
  • April 01, 2020: [Notice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 04, 2020: [Request]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2020: [Request]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 30, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 29, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 29, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 08, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.