U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Long
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 05, 2021: [Sentencing]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 25, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 16, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 16, 2021: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 15, 2021: [Extend]
  • February 12, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 12, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 16, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 16, 2020: [Consent]
  • November 12, 2020: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 12, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 12, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 12, 2020: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 12, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Request]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 10, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.