U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hendrix
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • December 07, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sentencing]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • November 30, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 30, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 30, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 30, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 30, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 09, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 02, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 12, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 09, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 09, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 25, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 24, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 24, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Hearing]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 06, 2020: [Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 13, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Request]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 12, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 12, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 12, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • March 12, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 11, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • March 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 11, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 27, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2020: [Request]
  • January 13, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 13, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 09, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.