U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jensen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 06, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 15, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 15, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 27, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 27, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 10, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 10, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.