U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nordstrom
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 22, 2022: [Forfeiture]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Declaration of Publication]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 14, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 16, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 13, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 09, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 16, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 11, 2020: [Furlough]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 27, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 27, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 23, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 08, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order of Detention]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 03, 2020: [Bail Report]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 16, 2020: [Consent]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 12, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 12, 2020: [Request]
  • February 12, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 22, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 17, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 17, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 17, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • January 15, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 13, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.