U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-30008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whiting
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • October 08, 2020: [Forfeiture]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • September 29, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 23, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 21, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 21, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 26, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 27, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 23, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 23, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 15, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 30, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 30, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 28, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 28, 2020: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • April 27, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 17, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Request]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 13, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 13, 2020: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 02, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Sealed Evaluation]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 29, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 27, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 27, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 27, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 27, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 27, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 27, 2020: [Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 27, 2020: [Request]
  • January 27, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 27, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 15, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.