U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harrison et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 15, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 19, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 16, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • July 16, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 16, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 15, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • July 15, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 07, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 07, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • May 09, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 07, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 07, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 07, 2021: [Transcript]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 29, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 26, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 20, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • April 14, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 12, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 08, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 08, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 07, 2021: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 01, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Consent]
  • February 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 16, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 16, 2021: [Consent]
  • February 10, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 02, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 02, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 02, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 02, 2021: [Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2021: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 27, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 23, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 14, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 11, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • December 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 02, 2020: [Consent]
  • October 02, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 02, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 28, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 23, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 23, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 23, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 24, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 17, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 17, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 17, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 12, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 12, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 12, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 12, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • June 09, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 08, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 02, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 02, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Consent]
  • February 26, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 26, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 26, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 26, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 26, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 26, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • February 25, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • February 25, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 25, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 24, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 21, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 21, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 21, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [Request]
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 19, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 15, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 14, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 14, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 13, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • February 13, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 13, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 23, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.