U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-40023
  • Case Name: Jammie Jo Koepp
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 08, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reschedule Hearing (trustee's motion) (text order)]
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
April, 2022
  • April 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • April 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • February 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.