U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-30025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kills Enemy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • February 03, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 02, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 02, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 29, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 05, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 17, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 17, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 08, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 17, 2020: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 17, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 12, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 21, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • May 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 21, 2020: [Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 21, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 21, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
  • May 21, 2020: [Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 19, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 19, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 19, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • May 19, 2020: [Request]
  • May 18, 2020: [Request]
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.