open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:20-cr-40033-1
    Party Name:USA v. Ibarra-Perocier
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Passport - Receipt of]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?68011
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =