U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Deel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • February 24, 2021: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 24, 2021: [Text Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • February 19, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 19, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 17, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 17, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 19, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 18, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 18, 2020: [Consent]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 08, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 08, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 11, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 20, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 07, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 30, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Request]
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 21, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 21, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 21, 2020: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.