U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kirk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 20, 2023: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 20, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 20, 2023: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 20, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 20, 2023: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2023: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 13, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 12, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 12, 2020: [Consent]
  • November 10, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 10, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 04, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 03, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 08, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 28, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 28, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 18, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 18, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 07, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 07, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 03, 2020: [Extend]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2020: [Status Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 07, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Request]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 11, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 11, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • March 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.