U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Manuylo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 30, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 30, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 17, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 17, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 15, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 08, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 08, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 18, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 15, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 14, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 14, 2020: [Reconsideration]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 22, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 06, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 06, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 06, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 06, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 06, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 06, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 06, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 04, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 04, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 03, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.