U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilkes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Passport - Return of]
  • October 25, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Consent]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 20, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 20, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 18, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 22, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 29, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 27, 2022: [For Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 25, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 18, 2022: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • March 17, 2022: [Indictment - Superseding]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 25, 2022: [For Order]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [For Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 13, 2021: [For Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [For Order]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 28, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 16, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 12, 2020: [For Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [For Order]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 06, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 04, 2020: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 04, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 04, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 04, 2020: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.