U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Running Shield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 13, 2020: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • November 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 12, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 29, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 25, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 17, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 17, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 16, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 16, 2020: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 16, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 16, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 16, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 16, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 02, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 25, 2020: [Extend]
  • August 11, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 01, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 01, 2020: [Consent]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 23, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 23, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 23, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 09, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 04, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 12, 2020: [Request]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 09, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 06, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 06, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 06, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 06, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 06, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • March 06, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 06, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 06, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.