U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-30047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bear Heels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 05, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 05, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 05, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 26, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 26, 2020: [Extend]
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 12, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 08, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 25, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 24, 2020: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 24, 2020: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 17, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 13, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing (FOR COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 12, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 12, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • March 12, 2020: [Request]
  • March 11, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 11, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 10, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.