U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-30056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Riley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2023: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 10, 2023: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • December 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 19, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 15, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 15, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 01, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 10, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 10, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 10, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 10, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 20, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 15, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • October 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 13, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 30, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2020: [Response]
  • September 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 31, 2020: [Dismiss Count]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 15, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Request]
  • March 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 13, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 12, 2020: [Request]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2020: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • March 12, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 12, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing (FOR COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 12, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 10, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 10, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.