U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-30055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sharp Butte
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 19, 2020: [Notice]
  • October 19, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 04, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 29, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 29, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 23, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 23, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 14, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 03, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 03, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 10, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 27, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • April 22, 2020: [Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 21, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • April 09, 2020: [Oral Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 25, 2020: [Request]
  • March 25, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Request]
  • March 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 13, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 12, 2020: [Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 12, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 12, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • March 11, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 10, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 10, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.