U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blom
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 15, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Passport - Return of]
  • November 04, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 29, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 27, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 25, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 25, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 04, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 01, 2021: [Extend]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 26, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2021: [Response]
  • June 11, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 04, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 04, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 21, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order of Recusal]
  • July 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 02, 2020: [Passport - Receipt of]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Status Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 08, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Request]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • March 16, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.