U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-30044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 06, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 06, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 06, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 06, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 29, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 29, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 29, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 24, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 21, 2020: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 07, 2020: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 07, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 20, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 16, 2020: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 15, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 15, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 15, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 15, 2020: [Extend]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.