U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-04057
  • Case Name: Brakeall v. Bieber et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 22, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal (attorney use)]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • August 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 23, 2022: [Brief]
  • May 06, 2022: [Briefing Schedule]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • March 18, 2022: [Substitute Party]
  • March 18, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • March 18, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 04, 2022: [Extend]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 18, 2022: [Response]
  • February 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 08, 2022: [Extend]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 17, 2022: [Extend]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 14, 2021: [Extend]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 01, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 01, 2021: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 01, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • December 01, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • November 17, 2021: [Substitute Party]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 26, 2021: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 04, 2021: [Stay]
  • January 04, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 24, 2020: [Extend]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • September 02, 2020: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 11, 2020: [Extend Deadlines]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Supplement]
  • April 21, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • April 17, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.