U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zephier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 19, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 06, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 06, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 24, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 10, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • March 04, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • March 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 03, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • March 03, 2021: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 03, 2021: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • March 03, 2021: [Verdict]
  • March 03, 2021: [Response to Jury Question]
  • March 03, 2021: [Jury Question]
  • March 03, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 03, 2021: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • March 03, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 02, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Jury List]
  • March 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Witness List]
  • February 26, 2021: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice]
  • February 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 25, 2021: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • February 25, 2021: [Witness List]
  • February 25, 2021: [Transcript]
  • February 24, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 23, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 23, 2021: [In Limine]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice]
  • February 23, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • February 22, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • February 22, 2021: [In Limine]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 18, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 12, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 02, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 19, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 18, 2020: [Transcript]
  • August 17, 2020: [Supplement]
  • August 14, 2020: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • August 13, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 13, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • August 13, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 07, 2020: [Receipt]
  • August 07, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 06, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 04, 2020: [Extend]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 28, 2020: [Suppress]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2020: [Status Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.