U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-04063
  • Case Name: Johnson et al v. Wright et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 17, 2020: [Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [Discovery Report]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • June 30, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 29, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice]
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 15, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • April 14, 2020: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.