U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-04065
  • Case Name: Albrecht et al v. Tesla Transport Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2021: [Dismiss]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Acknowledgment of Service]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 13, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Discovery Report]
  • May 27, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 26, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 26, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 21, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 19, 2020: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • May 19, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • May 15, 2020: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • May 04, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 04, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 15, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • April 15, 2020: [Request for Issuance of Summons(es)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.