U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-04068
  • Case Name: Bryant v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 07, 2022: [Compel]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 21, 2022: [Letter Received]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Letter Received]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 09, 2021: [Letter Received]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 20, 2021: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • May 20, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 19, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • May 19, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 19, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 03, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 03, 2021: [Letter Received]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2021: [Letter Received]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Letter Received]
  • March 15, 2021: [Letter Received]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 05, 2021: [Letter Received]
  • February 01, 2021: [Letter Received]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Response]
  • January 21, 2021: [Certificate]
  • January 20, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 19, 2021: [Extend]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 04, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Supplement]
  • December 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 18, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • December 14, 2020: [Letter Received]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 11, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 11, 2020: [Certificate]
  • December 11, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 11, 2020: [Extend]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 24, 2020: [Extend]
  • November 12, 2020: [Supplement]
  • November 12, 2020: [Certificate]
  • November 10, 2020: [Request]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 06, 2020: [Extend]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 02, 2020: [Extend]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 18, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 08, 2020: [Extend]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 23, 2020: [Extend]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 25, 2020: [Response]
  • June 25, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 22, 2020: [Supplement]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 18, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 18, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [New Case Letter - 2255 Prisoner Case]
  • April 21, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 21, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (28:2255) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.