U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 17, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 13, 2022: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 04, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 02, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 15, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • October 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 27, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 27, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 27, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 10, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 10, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Furlough]
  • October 14, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 25, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 18, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 18, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 24, 2020: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 24, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 24, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 24, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • July 22, 2020: [Request]
  • July 21, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [Request]
  • July 13, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 13, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 27, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 24, 2020: [Request]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 22, 2020: [Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 22, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 22, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • April 22, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • April 22, 2020: [Request]
  • April 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 21, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.