U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-04072
  • Case Name: Augustine v. Pitchford et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 12, 2021: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • August 12, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • August 12, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 12, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 12, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Response]
  • December 15, 2020: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 15, 2020: [Declaration]
  • December 15, 2020: [Brief]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 23, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 18, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 18, 2020: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 18, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • November 18, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 18, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 16, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2020
  • September 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • September 25, 2020: [File Excess Pages]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Strike]
  • August 12, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 08, 2020: [Supplement]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 29, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 19, 2020: [Declaration]
  • June 19, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 19, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 17, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 12, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • June 04, 2020: [Letter Sent]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • May 14, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [New Case Letter - 1983 Prisoner Case]
  • April 27, 2020: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.