U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:07-cr-40114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wood
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 31, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 19, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 14, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 08, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 21, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 21, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 21, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 13, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.