U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Wash et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • February 04, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 02, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 11, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 10, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • June 10, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 09, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 09, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • June 04, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 01, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 01, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 29, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 29, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 04, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.