U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:02-cr-50025-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bolzer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • June 12, 2020: [Supplement]
  • June 12, 2020: [Response]
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 09, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 05, 2020: [Response]
  • June 05, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 04, 2020: [Extend]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Supplement]
  • May 15, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • May 14, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • May 11, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.