U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-04004
  • Case Name: Maturin v. Blue Nile
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • July 02, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • June 29, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • June 14, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 12, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • May 12, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • May 11, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.