U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-10016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medina-Padilla et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 07, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 13, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 19, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 14, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 10, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 10, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 09, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • November 09, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Oral Scheduling Order]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 09, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 04, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 04, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 03, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 03, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 13, 2020: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.